+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 837.
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 946 reported by the Committee on Education (15-0).
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (5)
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 1076, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1549)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1076, AMENDMENT # 5346 BY RISER, 1-7 and 9 (#1548)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 3
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1076, FINAL PASSAGE (#1554)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1076, CO-AUTHORS (#1555)
- Yeas: 30
- Absent: 9
April 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 1076, FINAL PASSAGE (#266)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor