+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 535.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 672 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (14-0).
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1074, FINAL PASSAGE (#1275)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 1074, FINAL PASSAGE (#263)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor