+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 222.
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 140 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (15-0).
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1072, FINAL PASSAGE (#798)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
April 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 1072, FINAL PASSAGE (#261)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor