+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Veto message read. Lies over under the rules.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 103, FINAL PASSAGE (#885)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
May 20, 2021: House Vote on HB 103, FINAL PASSAGE (#598)
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 13