+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 564.
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (19-0).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 1025, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1547)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
May 28, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1025, FINAL PASSAGE (#1464)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 28, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1025, CO-AUTHORS (#1465)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 13
May 5, 2014: House Vote on HB 1025, FINAL PASSAGE (#729)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (129)
Type:
Primary Sponsor