+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 54. Failed to pass.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Vote
May 18, 2016: House Vote on HB 1017, FINAL PASSAGE (#905)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor