+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 833.
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Conference Committee report received.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Schroder, Carter, and Pearson.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Claitor, and White.
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (10-4).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 2, 2014: House Vote on HB 1015, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1662)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
June 2, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1015, ADOPT (#1770)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 30, 2014: House Vote on HB 1015, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1529)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
May 28, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#1460)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1015, CO-AUTHORS (#1461)
- Yeas: 16
- Absent: 23
May 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#769)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (102)
Type:
Primary Sponsor