+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 157.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#688)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2016: House Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#483)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor