+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 24, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 7/1/2018.
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 24, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/18.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/21/18.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (12-5).
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (4)
November 6, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, AMENDMENT # 110 BY CARTER, S., MOTION TO ADOPT (#5)
November 6, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#7)
November 6, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#11)
November 6, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#24)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor