+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/18.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (19-0).
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 10, CO-AUTHORS (#39)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 11
March 5, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#40)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#41)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#29)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor