+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#87)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 20
March 22, 2018: House Vote on HB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#87)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor