+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB535ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
- Reconsidered by Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by C. N. R. (19-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 4
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 987291208