+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0921)
On March 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 921 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1230ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (34-Y 5-N)
- House sub. w/amds. agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Wardrup withdrawn
- Read third time
- Committee substitute reconsidered
- Committee substitute rejected
- Amendments by Del. Wardrup reconsidered
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. w/amds 039428568-H2
- Floor substitute printed 039428568-H2 (Wardrup)
- Substitute by Del. Wardrup agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Armstrong agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Title amendment agreed to by Senate
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (89-Y 10-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 039417568-H1
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Amendments by Del. Wardrup agreed to
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 039417568-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (19-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted 039388568-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 039388568-S1
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039388568-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039388568-S1
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (13-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 034103568
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (34-Y 5-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Tra. w/sub (19-Y 3-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: Reported from Transportation w/sub (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor