+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ709ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105473D-S1 (95-Y 2-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ709S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105473D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105473D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 15101574D
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor