+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 32-4
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor