+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 155)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Bill passed 36-0
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 74-17 with Committee Substitute
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2018
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- To Local Government
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2018
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
HCS1/LM
Retain original provisions; make technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor