+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 11)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 33-5
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 88-10 with Committee Substitute
- Floor amendment (1) defeated
- 3rd reading
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from Education (H)
- 2nd reading
- Returned to Education (H)
- Posting waived
- Posted in committee
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Education (H)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Education (H)
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- To Education (H)
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with floor amendment (1)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2012
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
SFA (1, D. Givens)
Retain original language except clarify that the provisions apply only to public schools.
HCS
Retain original provisions except require school attendance until age 18 in all districts once 55% of districts require children to attend school until age 18; direct that the statewide requirement become effective four years after the 55% threshold is met.
HFA (1, D. Floyd)
Retain original provisions except that a school council, instead of local school board, may adopt a policy to require children residing in the school's attendance area to attend school until the child has reached his or her eighteenth birthday except as provided in KRS 159.030.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor