+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 15)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 27-0
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor