+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 73)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 92-1
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 30 -2 -1 with Floor Amendment (1)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules floor amendment (1) filed posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2023
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- to Licensing & Occupations (S)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)