+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 27-10
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 23, 2015
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor