+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 085)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- received in Senate posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019 Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) Bill passed 37-0
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- received in House
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 33-0
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor