+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Floor amendment (2) filed
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue
- Taken from the Orders of the Day
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- To State Government
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 30, 2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
HFA2
Specify that the Secretary of State shall send a copy of a new notary certificate to the county clerk and inform the notary that the certificate shall be filed with the county clerk; amend KRS 64.012 to allow a county clerk to charge a notary $10 to file a new notary certificate.
HFA1/P
Amend KRS 423.010 to provide that retired justices and judges shall have the powers of notaries public.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor