+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Posting waived
- To Banking & Insurance
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 (Consent Orders #1)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS1
Amend KRS 304.47-060 to extend existing civil immunity provisions in certain situations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor