+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 030)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- floor amendment (1) withdrawn 3rd reading, passed 56-42
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- floor amendment (1) filed
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- to Education (H)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- received in House
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 23-13 with floor amendment (1)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 11, 2019 floor amendment (1) filed
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from Education (S) 2nd reading returned to Education (S)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate taken from Committee on Committees (S) 1st reading returned to Committee on Committees (S) to Education (S)