+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (2) filed
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 14
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SFA2
Retain original provisions; add language to clarify references to enacted appropriations and statutory appropriations; add reference to funds being obligated for purposes of federal funds; amend KRS 40.005 to direct what should happen if a constitutional officer recovers funds while the General Assembly is not in session.
SFA1
Retain original provisions; add language to clarify references to enacted appropriations and statutory appropriations.