+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts ch. 74)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage for concurrence in House committee amendment (1-title) Senate concurred in House committee amendment (1-title) passed 31-0 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with committee amendment (1-title) received in Senate
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- returned to Rules
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 received in House
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- to Health & Welfare (S)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor