+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- delivered to Secretary of State became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 190)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 84-8 received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Education (H) 1st reading returned to Education (H)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- to Education (H)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 27-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 02, 2022
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Education (S)
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)