+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 30-4 with Committee Substitute
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Remove requirement that firearms safety courses provide applicants with a manual created by the Department of Criminal Justice Training; limit the prohibition against possession of a loaded firearm while drinking alcoholic beverages to only the room on the licensed premises where the alcoholic beverages are sold; exclude certain law enforcement officers acting in the course of their duties; restore firearm exemption for bona fide public restaurants that seat at least 50 persons and receive less than 50% of their income from the sale of alcoholic beverages.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor