+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 074)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in Senate posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Thursday, March 14, 2019 Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) Bill passed 37-0 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) Committee Substitute (1) filed
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- received in House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor