+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- To Transportation
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-2 with floor amendment (1)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Transportation
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendment
SFA1
Provide bicycle passing exceptions for commercial or farm vehicles with a weight greater than 26,000 lbs., vehicles operating under an overweight over-dimensional permit, and any farm tractor or farm machinery.