+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- to Health & Family Services (H)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-1
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Health & Welfare (S)
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor