+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) passed 32 -0 )
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Rules (S)
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- to Education (H)
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 33-0
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2023
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- taken from Education (S) 1st reading returned to Education (S)
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- to Education (S)
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor