+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- To Education
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Received in House
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 20
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS1
Retain original provisions; clarify the discharge evidence provisions; require academic content knowledge to be aligned with the offer of employment.