+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 42)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Judiciary (H)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2014
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor