+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
- Taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary (S)
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SCS/LM
Amend to provide for alternative dates where expanded DNA collection may begin or be delayed based upon funding and pending court decisions and to provide for the dissemination of information about DNA sample collection expungement requests.
SFA (1, W. Westerfield)
Amend to make conforming change to KRS 17.175 to include arrestee samples within the centralized DNA database.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor