+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-3 with Committee Substitute
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2014
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Retain original provisions, except exclude primary forestry products from items that could exceed the gross weight provisions by a weight tolerance of 10%, when transported by a vehicle registered under KRS 186.050(3); add poultry to items specified in the provisions of KRS 189.222(10).
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor