+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 23-13
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate