+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 195)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) Bill passed 36-0 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H) posted in committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 26-3
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)