+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Bill passed 24-9-1
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Rules (S)
- Received in Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 58-35 with Committee Substitute
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from Licensing & Occupations (H)
- Posting waived
- 1st reading
- Returned to Licensing & Occupations (H)
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 25-10 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
HCS
Amend KRS 238.505 to define "electronic video gaming device" and add exceptions to the definition of "year"; amend KRS 238.535 to extend the exemption for licensure date to January 31; amend KRS 238.540 to require gaming supplies to be maintained in a location separate from another organizer's supplies.
SCS
Amend definition of "electronic pulltab device" to stipulate that they are only to be used for charitable purposes, shall not include mobile phone, and shall operate only on a closed network; amend KRS 238.545 to specify that electronic pulltab devices shall be used only for charitable gaming.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor