+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 16)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 95-0
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- to Transportation (H)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Transportation (S)
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)