+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in Senate
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-0
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- Posting waived
- Taken from State Government
- 1st reading
- Returned to State Government
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- To State Government
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 (Consent Orders #1)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
- Returned to Committee on Committees
- 1st reading
- Taken from Committee on Committees
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Committee on Committees
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor