+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- to Health Services (S)
On January 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor