+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 125)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Posting waived
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- To Health and Family Services
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor