+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
- Reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
- 1st reading
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a consent bill
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 1st reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS1
Retain original provisions; amend KRS 56.813 to allow the Finance and Administration Cabinet to expend state agency funds up to $600,000 to improve a leased building that the state will own upon termination of the lease if no modification of the lease may be made; amend KRS 56.823 to require the cabinet to report to the Capital Projects and Bond Oversight Committee before any improvements may be made on a leased building; declare an EMERGENCY.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor