+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 193)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House receded from floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to concur in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
- Posted for passage for receding from House floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
- Bill passed 86-1
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Rules
- Received in Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for March 29, 2017
- Floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- Returned to Small Business & Information Technology
- 1st reading
- Taken from Small Business & Information Technology
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- To Small Business & Information Technology
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
- 1st reading
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor