+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- To State Government (H)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 11, 2015
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- To: Interim Joint Committee on State Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor