+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 1st reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SCA1
Make title amendment.
SCS1
Create the Kentucky Coal Fields Endowment Fund to be used for the purpose of supporting efforts to diversify the economy of the coal fields within Kentucky; create the Kentucky Coal Fields Endowment Fund authority to determine who received disbursements from the fund; appropriate $7,500,000 annually for the fund.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor