+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 3rd reading, passed 22-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2) received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor