+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 120)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) passed 29-6
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Rules (S)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 73-22 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) 2nd reading returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) 1st reading returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 26-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)