+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2)
- Taken from Rules
- Recommitted to Health & Welfare
- Passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (2)
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2016
- 3rd reading
- Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue
- Taken from Rules
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SCS2
Retain original provisions of the bill except to require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the external independent third party review; permit reasonable fees up to $1,000; declare an EMERGENCY.
SCS1
Retain original provisions of the bill except to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to conduct hearings instead of the Office of the Attorney General; change the time to make a decision from 30 to 60 days; require the hearing officer to determine administrative costs to be reimbursed; increase the fee for the party not prevailing from $100 to $250; declare an EMERGENCY.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor